Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Receivables Performance Management, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Burns, Martin, against Jar Associates, represented by Brain, Christopher Ian, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award /amended |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response in Opposition to Motion for Attorneys' Fees |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Counter Claim | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Proposed Arbitrators | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Arbitrability | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.