Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Leifer, Kelly, Leifer, Kirk, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Neunzig, Bradley E., against Leifer Development No 1, Leifer Development No 2, represented by Bigsby, Thomas Drake, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Tracy G. Waggoner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy G. Waggoner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Waggoner, Tracy G |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Re Dependent of a Person in Military Service | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.