Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Molly Maid Of Mill Creek & Woodinville, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Department Of Labor & Industries, Jimenez-Serrano, Beatriz, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Anita L. Farris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnita L. Farris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Farris, Anita L |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Appeal Board Record | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.