Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garner, Ronald L, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Smith, Walter, against Dwayne Lanes Automotive Inc, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Patrick M. Moriarty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick M. Moriarty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Moriarty, Patrick M |
|
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.