Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lundquist, Josilyn E, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Leritz, Arthur D, against Amarillo Co, Bonner, Jane Doe, Bonner, Robert J, Papas, State Of Washington, (total of 5) See All represented by Bendele, Levi Lewis, Iii, Hudson, Thomas Edward, Mordekhov, David D, Trinidad, Oscar Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Anita L. Farris presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnita L. Farris Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Farris, Anita L |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing CONFIRMED/PALMER Judge: Farris, Anita L |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Litigant | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Opposition by Arthur D. Leritz |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Opposition to Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.