Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gipson, Ron, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against City Of Mill Creek, represented by Kitson, Michael T., in the jurisdiction of Snohomish County, WA, . Snohomish County, WA Superior Courts with Paul W. Thompson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul W. Thompson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSnohomish County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mandate motion for dismissal is granted |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Transmittal Letter Copy Filed | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal to Court of Appeals | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Summary Judgment | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Copy Order Granting Defendant's Motion for SummaryJudgment |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing
Judge: Duran, Miguel M |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment -Gipson - CONFIRMED/R GIPSON PRO SE Judge: Duran, Miguel M |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.