Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gracieworld Trust, And Zephyr Farms, A Washington Limited Liability Corporation, Jean-Wolf Mcadoo, Lacey, Mcadoo, Gregory L, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lorber, Abraham K, against Emory, Killian, Vang, Dai E., represented by Zandell, Trevor Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney and Substitution of Counsel |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Notice of Unavailability for Trevor A. Zandell |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer To Amended Complaint |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Re Trial Date |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint *Stipulated Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit - of Emailed Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.