Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland, Dale, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Broer, Grant Clark, Muth, Robert Curtis, against Maddux, Andy, Maddux, Heather Lynn, Midland, Deana, Midland, Scott, represented by Andersen, Bradley W., Lindberg, Jeffrey Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability Jeff Lindberg |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: McCray, Vernon H |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition - Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Judge: McCray, Vernon H |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment Hearing | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiffs' Reply Declaration |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Certificate of Service |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.