Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kruger, Charmaine L, Kruger, Jack D, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Conway, Jesse David, against Hora, Donna L, Hora, Rodney L, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Plaintiff's Mr & Ord for Vol Dsm With Prejudice 7 Without Costs Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Default
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.