Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Miscellaneous Court Orders, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Administrative order Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Administrative Order Closing Superior Court Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order General Order Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Tenth Emergency Administrative Order, Order Rescinding All Prior Covid-19 Emergency Orders Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Judge Michael Evens to review GAL Complaint Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Administrative Order Closing Superior Court - 1/5/22 Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Administrative Order Closing Superior Court - 1/4/22 Judge: Krog, Randall C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.