Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Gunn, Ernest H Aka Gunn, Ernest Herb, Gunn, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2017 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment for Continuing Lien on Earnings |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Release of Writ of Garnishment |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.