Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Archer, Barbara Kay filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2016 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition Motion to Modify /Terminate Order for Protection |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Protection Order Review |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Office Receipt 7: SHERIFF'S OFFICE RECEIPT; |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 6: ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.