Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hill, Amy, Hill, Jeremy, Ward, John, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Phelan, Thomas C., against Calarco, Michael, Zylawy, Dawson, represented by Barger, Glenn Earle, Foley, Douglas Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2017 |
CategoryWde Wrongful Death |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Stipulated | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Summons | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition to Amend Complaint |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint -Wrongful Death |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 4: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.