Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chronister, Terry Ray filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2017 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 16: MOTION HEARING; |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
S1 Standby Motion Calendar 9AM - MT FOR CLARIFICATION ON PROT |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 15: NOTICE OF HEARING; 03-17-2017S1; 9AM - MT FOR CLARIFICATION ON PROT; |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion 14: MOTION TO CLARIFY PROT ORDER; |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 13: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 12: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 11: MOTION HEARING; |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
S1 Standby Motion Calendar 9AM - MODIFY/TERM PROTECT ORDER |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10: NOTICE OF HEARING; 01-27-2017S1; 9AM - MODIFY/TERM PROTECT ORDER; |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition Motion to Modify 9: MOTION TO MODIFY/TERM ORD OF PROT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.