Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cach, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Vos, Ryan Earl, against Peppiatt, Doe, Peppiatt, Jason L, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2016 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment for Continuing Lien on Earnings |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 9: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application 8: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 7: ORDER OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order -: EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 6: DCLR IN SUPP OF JUDGMENT; |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment 5: MT/DCLR FOR DEFAULT &DEFAULT JDGMNT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.