Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Soule, Noah R, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Archer, Katy Jane, against All Other Occupants, Hughes, Dallas, in the jurisdiction of Skamania County, WA, . Skamania County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2016 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkamania County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerks Order of Dismissal | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution & Declaration of Mailing |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 21: NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Castle, Ryan Christopher; |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 20: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Castle, Ryan Christopher; |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 19: MOTION HEARING; |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
S2 Standby Motion Calendar 1:30- MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 18: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.