Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sb&C Ltd, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Englund, Jeannie, against Nunez Reyes, Lucy D, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryTrj Transcript Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Release OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment FIRST ANSWER |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Transfer of Judgment | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transcript of Judgment Y18-00182 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.