Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rpi Mt Vernon Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Neale, Philip Scott, against All Other Occupants, Oceanview Construction Group Llc, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth Y. Neidzwski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Y. Neidzwski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Commercial Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Restitution | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Restitution
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment and Order for Writ of Restitution
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER OF WRIT OF RESTITUTION AND JUDGMENT |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Re Service
Judge: Shand, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.