Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Deidre Hoole, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Judd, Paul, against Baldwin, John Jane Doe, Baldwin, Victor, Western Washington Coca-Cola Bottling Llc, represented by Scruggs, Michael Paul, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit NON SERVICE |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service not Found | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Return of Service not Found | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint FOR SUMS DUE TO A SUBROGATED PARTY |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.