Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Simpson, Everett, Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by West, Thomas Joseph, against Geico Advantage Insurance Company, represented by Ayers, Gerrit Jonathan, Elsinger, William L., in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Brian L. Stiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian L. Stiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint FOR CONTRACTUAL UNINSURED & UNDERINSURED MOTORIST BENEFITS (PERSONAL INJURY) |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.