Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pedersen, Cheryl F, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Thal, Spencer Nathan, against Public Hospital District No. 1, Skagit County, Washington, represented by Emch, Christopher Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Thomas L. Verge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas L. Verge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.