Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Castillo Pina, Abel N, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pepper, Benjamin Andrew, Zimmerman, Guy Brandon, against Oehring, Norman B, Oehring, Pat Doe, On Your Side Nationwide Insurance Agency, Inc., represented by Andersen, Stephanie S., Crowley, Paul Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Brian L. Stiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian L. Stiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice & STIPULATION Judge: Crandall, Mary K |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice & STIPULATION Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.