Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rodriguez Garcia, Elias, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Coppinger Carter, Carrie M, against Brinderson, L.P., Coleman, Adam, Coleman, Jane Doe, represented by Carpenter, Megan Burrows, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation AGREEING TO E-SERVICE |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.