Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Preview Rentals, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Lehr, Timothy Cristofer, against Flores, Jessica, represented by Bowen, Patricia Jean, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Heather D. Shand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHeather D. Shand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evictions AGREED Judge: Crandall, Mary K |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order NOT RECORDED Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evictions LEHR Judge: Crandall, Mary K |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Continuance
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order AVC 3/1:17 Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fndg and Ord Appoint Atty and Waiver of Fees
Judge: Shand, Heather |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.