Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jovee, Nathan, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Appel, George, Bui, Tam, City Of Sultan, County Of Snohomish, County Of Snohomish Everett District Court, (total of 16) See All represented by Christy, Joseph, Jr, Evans, Hillary J., Severson, Deborah A, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Brian L. Stiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian L. Stiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 04, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy OF U.S. DISTRICT COURT CIVIL DOCKET FOR 2:21-CV-01590-RSM |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy OF ORDER FROM U.S DISTRICT COURT WESTERN DISTRICT, ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance MEERA SHIN |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance and Request for Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.