Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Falcone, April, Falcone, Chris, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cwi Inc,, Cwi Inc, Dba Camping World, Foley Rv Center, Llc, Lemonis, Marcus, National Rv Supply, (total of 5) See All represented by Lis, Daniel Louis, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Riquelme, Laura M |
|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response TO ANSWER TO THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOR DAMAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.