Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Muzik, Theresa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fleming, Sarah Elizabeth, against Skagit Transit, Washington State Transit Insurance Pool, represented by Bundy, Kristofer John, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Thomas L. Verge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas L. Verge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice & STIPULATION Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Transferring to Civil Arbitration
Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint FOR DAMAGES UNDER UIM INSURANCE COVERAGE |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.