Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dutton, Joshua, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Youssef, Ziad Iskandar, against Abc Companies 1-100, Bc Traffic Llc, Granite Construction Company, State Of Washington, represented by Bosworth, Claude F, Pujolar, Martin J, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Laura M. Riquelme presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura M. Riquelme Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition TO AMEND TO ASSERT CROSS-CLAIM AND STIPULATION Judge: Riquelme, Laura M |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Calendar | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion TO AMEND ANSWER TO ASSERT CROSS CLAIM |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER TO ASSERT CROSS CLAIM |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing YOUSSEF - DEFAULT Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.