Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Weiss, Caressa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tario, Michael John, against State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, represented by Takahashi, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Verge, Thomas L |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.