Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mount Vernon City Of, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sjostrom, Craig David, against Banner Bank, Great Plains Capital Corp, Internal Revenue Service, Reichlan, Paul, Reichlin, Charles, (total of 6) See All represented by Carroll, Terence G., in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Laura M. Riquelme presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura M. Riquelme Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Riquelme, Laura M |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & ORDER FORECLOSING INTEREST & DISMISSING THE US IRS Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance SPECIAL APPEARANCE |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.