Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cook'S Contracting, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bowen, Joseph D., against Pacific Framing, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.