Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Northridge Estates Hoa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ducich, Alexis Nicole, against Plumer, John Doe, Plummer, Shauna M., in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons 60 DAYS |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Re Service
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SPPT OF MTN FOR SERVICE BY PUB |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion TO ALLOW SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUB |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service not Found | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal OF NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION ONLY Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss DEFT NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Lis Pendens |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.