Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Armstrong, Kimberly L, Armstrong, Russell A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Vaughey, John R, against Blau, Gaberielle, Blau Oyster Co Inc, Blau, Steven, Christopher Sheu, Md., Ruff, Jon, (total of 7) See All represented by Reichert, Todd Wesley, Sweeney, Kelley J., Williams, Andrew Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Brian L. Stiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian L. Stiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice TO DEFENDANT GABRIELLE SHADLE Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition FOR RECONIDERATION OF SUM/JGMT DISMISSAL OF DFT SKAGIT CO PUB HOSP DISTR Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice PARTIAL DISMISSAL ONLY Judge: Shand, Heather |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR PARTIAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF READINESS OF PLTFS MTN |
|
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SPPT OF RESPONSE TO MTN FOR RECON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.