Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Paiz, Leandro, Paiz-Snodgrass, Celia, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Bergsma, Larry E., Discount Fence, Lee, Michellaine M., in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Riquelme, Laura M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreement SETTLEMENT - NOT AN ORDER |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Appearance Pro Se MICHELLAINE LEE, LARRY BERGSMA AND DISCOUNT TIRE |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Affirmative Defense and Counter or Cross Claim | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.