Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sturgeon Electric Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Zimbelman, Eric Brian, against Anacortes School District, Boe Bonding Companies I-X, Forma Construction Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Greene, Andrew Latimer, Marconi, Robert Scott, Thomas, Tyler Bracken, in the jurisdiction of Skagit County, WA, . Skagit County, WA Superior Courts with Elizabeth Y. Neidzwski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Y. Neidzwski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSkagit County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Neidzwski, Elizabeth |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Report | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order (STIPULATED) AND CLAWBACK AGREEMENT Judge: Stiles, Brian L |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.