Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Heckele, Kati, Heckele, Mark W., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Robbins, Lee C., White, Kirsten, represented by Hart, Kenneth Wayne, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts Superior with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2022 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Ex Parte Action With Order | ||
December 01, 2023 | Order of Dismissal | ||
December 01, 2023 | Stipulation | ||
December 01, 2023 | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | ||
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Strike Hearsay Statements |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion for Injunction Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.