Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Demeritt, Sean, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case against San Juan County, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Land Use Petition |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Courts Decision | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply Brief of Petitioner | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Brief of San Juan Co. |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.