Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brandli, Stephen A filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2022 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection From Civil Harassment AMENDED |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Protection From Civil Harassment | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.