Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Preston Hollow Capital, Llc, Nfn, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Bouldin, Mark, Senior Care Living Vi, Llc, Nfn, represented by Powers, Ragan Lewis, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Preston Hollow's Response to Endurance 2 LLC's Joinder |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Motion to Stay |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion to Stay |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.