Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Woodard, Georgina, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Oshan, Evan Matthew, against Fantasy Cruises Inc, John Jane Does 1-10, represented by Jordan, Charles S., in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated with Prejudice Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Strike Hearing 1/7/22 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Order WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Attorney Fee Award | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Fromer Attorney's Lien |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Evan Oshan |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Georgina Woodard in Support of Motion to Remove Former Attorney's Lien |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.