Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Percich, Monica, Percich, William, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Curtis, Neil, Courtesy Marine, Llc, represented by Browne, Joseph Malachy, Smith, Meredith Ann, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2018 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Stipulated of Dismissal |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant's |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Joseph Browne and Meredith Smith |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.