Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Estate Of Rayborn, Stanley, Terry, Rayborn, Jeffrey D, Rayborn, Suzan M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Helton, Sabrina C, represented by Miller, Benjamin Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2018 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Received - 12 Jury 8: JURY DEMAND RECEIVED - TWELVE; |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 9: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer 6: ANSWER /AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; |
|
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate 7: CERTIFICATE OF SERVIC; |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 5: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate 4: CERTIFICATE OF SERVCE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.