Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Martin, Richard P, Walden, Robin F, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mann, Derek A., against D'Haeze, Dawn Tmcct, D'Haeze, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts with Kathryn C. Loring presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathryn C. Loring Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2017 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and ORder Striking Show Cause Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing To Set Aside Default Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Email Striking Hearing |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Amended Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Moves hearing to 3:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.