Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Satin, Kenneth And Sandra, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Davis, Kenneth, Bachelder, Debra And Does 1-50, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2018 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Courts Decision | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Actual Proceeding Time | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment Hearing | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Minutes | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Continued Oral Argument Judge: Loring, Kathryn C |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Plaintiffs' to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing and Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Cease and Desist and for Damages and to Strike the Teseimony of Jack Corey |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Parties regarding change in time for May 18th hearing 1:30 to 3:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.