Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Honeywell, Dave, Honeywell, Nancy, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case against Wa St Dept Of Ecology, in the jurisdiction of San Juan County, WA, . San Juan County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryAlr Administrative Law Review |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationSan Juan County, WA |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandate to Superior Court for further proceedings |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision 63: COURT'S DECISION - COA UNPUBLISHED; |
|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter 62: LETTER TO ATTY O'DAY RE POSTAGE; DUE: $32.21; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter 61: LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL TO COA; TWO BOXES; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerks Papers Sent -: CLERK'S PAPERS SENT; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Copy 60: COPY OF LABELS - VOL 1 AND 2; |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Papers Fees Received 59: CLERK'S PAPERS - FEE RECEIVED; PLUS COPIES: 142.50; |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Index 57: INDEX AND TITLE PAGE; |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter 58: LETTER TO ATTY O'DAY RE; CLERK'S FEES DUE: 1216.00; |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter 56: PERFECTION LTR FROM COA; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.