Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel K. Walk filed a(n) Estate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with JAMES ORLANDO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES ORLANDO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryEstate |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
|
Case Outcome Type10/05/2021 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2026 | Hearing | None - None | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR REPORT OF AFFAIRS OF ESTATE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR NOTICE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPY OF INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CREDITOR'S CLAIM | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR NOTICE | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR INVENTORY | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING BENEFICIARIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.