Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kalii, Tammy Jo, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with FAMILY COURT - 2 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFAMILY COURT - 2 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryMinor Guardianship Custody |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome Type06/22/2021 Pers Rep/Guardian Appointed08/18/2021 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - TWO (Rm. 214A) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - TWO (Rm. 214A) - 9:00 Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - TWO (Rm. 214A) - None Confirmed |
|
October 01, 2021 | Hearing | None - None | |
August 25, 2021 | Hearing |
FAMILY LAW COURT - TWO (Rm. 214A) - Ex-Parte w/ Order Held Ex Parte Confirmed |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING/DISCHARGING COURT VISITOR | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
August 18, 2021 | Hearing |
C1- SHOW CAUSE/FAMILY LAW (Rm. 100 ) - Held Minor Guardianship Hearing Confirmed |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING MINOR GUARDIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.