Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Renda, Matt A., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with JAMES ORLANDO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJAMES ORLANDO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryMinor Settlement |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Outcome Type10/28/2022 Parties Settled/Aj Pre-Trial10/28/2022 Judgment/Order/Decree Filed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
May 19, 2023 | Hearing | None - None | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE ADDENDUM | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF FUNDS IN BLOCKED ACCOUNT | |
December 09, 2022 | Hearing |
DEPT 01 - JUDGE DAVIS (Rm. 323 ) - Cancelled/Stricken Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE ADDENDUM | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS REPORT | |
October 28, 2022 | Hearing |
JUDGE ORLANDO (Rm. 323 ) - Continued Mandatory - Court Review Hrg Confirmed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.