Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lemay, Ashley, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew H. Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew H. Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Protection |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type08/25/2021 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2021 | Hearing |
DEPT 13 - JUDGE THOMAS (Rm. 304 ) - 9:00 Motion - Revision Confirmed |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF ASHLEY LEMAY | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT OF 09.22.21 HEARING | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ASHLEY LEMAY | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTE FOR JUDGES MOTION CALENDAR | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REVISION OF COMMISSIONER'S RULING | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST CD OF HEARING W/FEE | |
September 22, 2021 | Hearing |
C2 - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (Rm. 117 ) - Held - Motion Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SEALED JIS/JABS REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.