Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Thung, Roeuy, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Pierce County, WA, . Pierce County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryVulnerable Adult |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPierce County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome Type08/23/2021 Uncontested Resolution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Hearing |
C1 - PROB/UNLAW DET/SUP PRO (Rm. 100 ) - 1:30 Final Protection Order Confirmed |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SERVICE | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING INFORMATION FORM | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF MAILING | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 24, 2021 | Hearing |
DV REVIEW - Held DVPO Hearing Confirmed |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTE ENTRY | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY VULNERABLE ADULT PROTECTION ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.